Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 06/28/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/30/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/19/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/19/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/07/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/07/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/07/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/06/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/18/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/12/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/12/2006