Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/09/2006