Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/14/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/28/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/14/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/19/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/19/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/16/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/16/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/16/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/16/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/27/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/13/2006