There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Mortgage Insurance Fairness Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow a deduction for premiums on mortgage insurance, and for other purposes.

Actions Overview (1)

06/28/2005 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

06/28/2005 Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/28/2005 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1382)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/28/2005 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (117)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/20/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/20/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/20/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/20/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/20/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/20/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/20/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/20/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/21/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/21/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/27/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/27/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/27/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/27/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/27/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/27/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/28/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/28/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/28/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/29/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/08/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/08/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/15/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/15/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/15/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/15/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/15/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/15/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/22/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/22/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/22/2005
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/22/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/29/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/29/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/29/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/29/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/26/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/26/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 10/26/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/26/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/26/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/17/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/17/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/17/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/17/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/17/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/17/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/09/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/04/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/08/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/28/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3098.

Subjects (14)

  • Federally-guaranteed loans
  • Government insurance
  • Government paperwork
  • Income tax
  • Insurance premiums
  • Interest
  • Mortgage guaranty insurance
  • Tax deductions
  • Tax returns

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3098. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/28/2005)

Mortgage Insurance Fairness Act of 2005 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow a tax deduction for mortgage insurance premiums. Reduces the amount of such deduction for taxpayers with adjusted gross incomes exeeding $100,000.

Authorizes the Secretary of the Treasury to require informational returns from any individual who receives payment of more than $600 in mortgage insurance premiums.