Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/28/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/20/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/20/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/20/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/20/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/20/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/20/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/20/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/20/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/21/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/21/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/27/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/27/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/27/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/27/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/27/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/27/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/28/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/28/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/28/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/29/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/08/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/08/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/15/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/15/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/15/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/15/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/15/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/15/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/22/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/22/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/22/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/22/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/29/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/29/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/29/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/29/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/26/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/26/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 10/26/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/26/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/26/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/17/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/17/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/17/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/17/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/17/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/17/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/09/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/04/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/08/2006