Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/29/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/07/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/07/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/15/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/15/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/01/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/05/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/05/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 04/05/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/20/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/05/2006