Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/02/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/02/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/02/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/02/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 02/02/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/02/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/02/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/02/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/02/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/02/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/02/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/02/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/02/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/02/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/02/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/02/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/02/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/02/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/02/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/02/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/02/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/10/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/13/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/21/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/28/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/05/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/05/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/05/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/05/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/05/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/05/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/05/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/05/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/05/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/05/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/05/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/05/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/05/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/05/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/05/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/05/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/12/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/12/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/12/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/12/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/12/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/12/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/12/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/12/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/12/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/19/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/19/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/19/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/08/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/08/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/08/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/08/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/08/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/08/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/08/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/15/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/15/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/15/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/15/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/15/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/22/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/22/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/22/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/18/2005