Refine your search

10 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
10/13/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-344.
10/13/2006 Signed by President.
10/02/2006 Presented to President.
09/25/2006 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H7313-7319; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7313-7316)
09/21/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/21/2006 Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
04/05/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 3 (Roll no. 90).(text: CR H1461-1463)
03/29/2006 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 109-392, Part II.
03/14/2006 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on 109-392, Part I.
06/30/2005 Introduced in House