Committees: H.R.3127 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations06/30/2005 Referred to
03/08/2006 Markup by
03/14/2006 Reported by H. Rept. 109-392,Part 1
House International Relations Subcommittee on Africa, Global Human Rights and International Operations07/21/2005 Referred to
07/21/2005 Markup by
07/21/2005 Reported by
House Judiciary03/14/2006 Referred to
03/15/2006 Markup by
03/29/2006 Reported by H. Rept. 109-392,Part 2
Senate Foreign Relations04/06/2006 Referred to
09/21/2006 Discharged from