Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/14/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/25/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/28/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/28/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/13/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/15/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/15/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/19/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/20/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/20/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/20/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/22/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/07/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/28/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/09/2005