There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Eminent Domain bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Private Property Rights Protection Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect private property rights.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/30/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
10/21/2005Subcommittee on the Constitution Discharged.
07/11/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/30/2005Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/30/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (136)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/30/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/14/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/14/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/14/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/14/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/18/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/18/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/19/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/25/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/25/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/25/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/27/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 07/27/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/06/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/08/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/08/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 09/08/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/15/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/26/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/26/2005

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/30/2005 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution07/11/2005 Referred to
10/21/2005 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3135. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/30/2005)

Private Property Rights Protection Act of 2005 - Prohibits a state or political subdivision from using economic development as a reason for exercising its power of eminent domain if federal funds would contribute in any way to: (1) the project for which eminent domain is exercised; or (2) the exercise and enforcement of eminent domain over the project. Renders a state or political subdivision that violations this prohibition ineligible for any such federal funds and directs the federal agency involved to withhold those funds.

Prohibits the federal government from using economic development as a reason for exercising eminent domain.

Defines "economic development" to mean any activity other than making private property available in substantial part for use by the general public or by an entity that makes the property available for use by the general public, or as a public facility, or to remove harmful effects.