Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/30/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/14/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/14/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/14/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/14/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/18/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/18/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/19/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/25/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/25/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/25/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/27/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 07/27/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/06/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/08/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/08/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 09/08/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/15/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/26/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/26/2005