Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/11/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/11/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/11/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/13/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/13/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/13/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/13/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/13/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/27/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/27/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/27/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/27/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/27/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/29/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/20/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/29/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/06/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/18/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/19/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/19/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/19/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/19/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/19/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/19/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/20/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/20/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/20/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/25/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/25/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/25/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/26/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/28/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/01/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/03/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/03/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/04/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/16/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/09/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/22/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/18/2006