Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/20/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/22/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/29/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/21/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/21/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/28/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/28/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/28/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/28/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/28/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/07/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/07/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/27/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/08/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/31/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/16/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/16/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/16/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/02/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/14/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/14/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/30/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/10/2006