Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/07/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/07/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/07/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/29/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/29/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 10/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/06/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/06/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/26/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/26/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 11/03/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/03/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 11/03/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/04/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 11/04/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 11/04/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 11/04/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/14/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/14/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/06/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/13/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/08/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/08/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/14/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/14/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/14/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/15/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/15/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/16/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/16/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/09/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/09/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/30/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/30/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/30/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/06/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/19/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/09/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/28/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/10/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2006