There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Criminal Alien Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 276 of the Immigration and Nationality Act to impose mandatory sentencing ranges with respect to aliens who reenter the United States after having been removed, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/30/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
08/23/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/30/2005Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/30/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/14/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/14/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/14/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/21/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/25/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/29/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/13/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/17/2005
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/16/2005

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary06/30/2005 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims08/23/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3150.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3150. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/30/2005)

Criminal Alien Accountability Act - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to establish minimum imprisonment terms for specified categories of aliens subject to criminal fines, imprisonment, or both, for reenrty as removed aliens. (Such provision does not apply to aliens removed for security or terrorist grounds.)

Subjects an individual who knowingly aids or conspires to allow, procure, or permit any such alien to reenter the United States to criminal penalty, the same imprisonment term as applies to the alien so aided, or both.

.