Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/14/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/14/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/14/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/21/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/25/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/29/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/13/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/17/2005
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/16/2005