Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/14/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/14/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/14/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/21/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/16/2005