Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/12/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/12/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/20/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/14/2006