Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/14/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/14/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/16/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/16/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/16/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/16/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/16/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/16/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/16/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/16/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/16/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/09/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/09/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/09/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/16/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/16/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 03/16/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/06/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/06/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/10/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/19/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/19/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/19/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/14/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/13/2006