Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/12/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/12/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/20/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/20/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/21/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/21/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/07/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/25/2006