Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/20/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/20/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/20/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/20/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/08/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/25/2005