Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/19/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/27/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/29/2005