Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/30/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/22/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/22/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/22/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/22/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/29/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/29/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/21/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/21/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/21/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/21/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/21/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/21/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/21/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/21/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/07/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/28/2005