Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/18/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/25/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/25/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/09/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/15/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/04/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/04/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/02/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/03/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/28/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/13/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/13/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/14/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/26/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/26/2006