Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/30/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/11/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/11/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/19/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/19/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/19/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/19/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/19/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/19/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/28/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/13/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/04/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/06/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/25/2006