Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/11/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/19/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/21/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/21/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/21/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/27/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/27/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/27/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/28/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/29/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/06/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 09/06/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/06/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/09/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/09/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/09/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/09/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/09/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/10/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/10/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/10/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/15/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/16/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/06/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/06/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/13/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/17/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/08/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/18/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/18/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/20/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/20/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/25/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/25/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/25/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/25/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/26/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/26/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/28/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/28/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/07/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/07/2006