Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/18/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/02/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/28/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/31/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/31/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/07/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/14/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/20/2006