Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/06/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/06/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/25/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/25/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/25/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/25/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/25/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/01/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/02/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/02/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/08/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/09/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/10/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/10/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/10/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/15/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/15/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/15/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/01/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/02/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/02/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/02/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/08/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/08/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/08/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/16/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/12/2005