There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Popular Titles

Increase Servicemembers' Group Life Insurance bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Servicemembers' Group Life Insurance Enhancement Act of 2005

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Servicemembers' Group Life Insurance Enhancement Act of 2005

Short Titles as Reported to House

Servicemembers' Group Life Insurance Enhancement Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Servicemembers' Group Life Insurance Enhancement Act of 2005

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Servicemembers' Group Life Insurance Enhancement Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to enhance the Servicemembers' Group Life Insurance program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
09/30/2005Became Public Law No: 109-80. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2005Signed by President.
09/29/2005Presented to President.
09/28/2005Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H8413-8416; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8413-8414)
09/27/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2005Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 420).(text: CR H6453-6454)
07/20/2005Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 109-177.
07/11/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (31)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/30/2005Became Public Law No: 109-80. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2005Signed by President.
09/29/2005HousePresented to President.
09/28/2005-1:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2005-1:35pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H8413-8416; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8413-8414)
09/28/2005-1:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 3200.
09/28/2005-1:28pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
09/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/27/2005SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2005SenateS.Amdt.1872 Amendment SA 1872 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2005SenateS.Amdt.1872 Amendment SA 1872 proposed by Senator Isakson for Senator Craig. (consideration: CR S10480; text: CR S10480) To provide a complete substitute.
09/27/2005SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10480)
09/27/2005SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/27/2005SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/26/2005-1:23pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 420). (text: CR H6453-6454)
07/26/2005-1:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/26/2005-1:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6464)
07/26/2005-12:04pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/26/2005-11:40amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3200.
07/26/2005-11:40amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6453-6458)
07/26/2005-11:40amHouseMr. Buyer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/20/2005HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 111.
07/20/2005HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 109-177.
07/14/2005HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/14/2005HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/13/2005HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
07/13/2005HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
07/12/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/11/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/11/2005HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1454)
07/11/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (18)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/11/2005 Referred to
07/14/2005 Markup by
07/20/2005 Reported by H. Rept. 109-177
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs07/12/2005 Referred to
07/13/2005 Markup by
07/13/2005 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/27/2005 Referred to
09/27/2005 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.3200.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.3200. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-80 (09/30/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 27, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Servicemembers' Group Life Insurance Enhancement Act of 2005 - Repeals, as of August 31, 2005, section 1012 of Division A of P.L. 109-13 which increased the maximum amount of coverage under the Servicemembers' Group Life Insurance (SGLI) program to $400,000 and, for members serving in certain areas or operations, allowed $150,000 of such amount to be paid for by the Secretary concerned. Reinstates Federal provisions concerning such coverage as in effect prior to the enactment of the above Act.

Reinstates the PL 109-13 SGLI $400,000 maximum member coverage amount.Requires the Secretary of the military department concerned to notify a member's spouse when a member who is married and is: (1) eligible for SGLI elects not to be so insured; (2) insured and whose spouse is designated as a beneficiary if the member elects coverage in an amount less than the maximum; or (3) insured makes a beneficiary designation of a person other than the member's spouse or child.

Requires amounts of SGLI elected by members to be evenly divisible by $50,000 (currently $10,000).