Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/11/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/13/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/14/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/20/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/20/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/20/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/20/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/20/2005