Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/19/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/08/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/08/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/14/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/21/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/27/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/06/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/01/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/09/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/14/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/14/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/29/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/29/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/16/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/16/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/14/2006