Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/13/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/21/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/22/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/27/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/27/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/27/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/27/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/27/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/27/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/27/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/27/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/27/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/27/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/27/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/27/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/27/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/27/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/27/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/27/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/27/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/27/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/27/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/27/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/27/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/27/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/29/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/29/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/29/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/29/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/29/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/29/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/29/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/29/2006
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/18/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/20/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/28/2006