Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/20/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/27/2005