There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow an investment tax credit for the purchase of trucks with new diesel engine technologies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/14/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
07/14/2005Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/14/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/14/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/14/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/14/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/14/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/14/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/14/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/14/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/21/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/21/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/21/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/21/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/21/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/21/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/27/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/19/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/27/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/03/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 11/03/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/03/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/10/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/16/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/17/2005

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/14/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3301. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/14/2005)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow an investment tax credit for five percent of the cost of a qualified truck. Defines "qualified truck" as a motor vehicle: (1) first placed in service on or after January 1, 2007, and before January 1, 2008; (2) powered by diesel fuel; (3) having a gross vehicle weight of more than 26,000 pounds; and (4) which complies with certain Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) regulations for diesel emissions. Allows such credit to reduce regular or alternative minimum tax liability.

Permits a taxpayer election to expense the cost of qualified trucks placed in service in 2007.