Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/26/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/26/2005

Show cosponsors who withdrew