Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/21/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/06/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/01/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/16/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/16/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/16/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/16/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/16/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/16/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/16/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/16/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/16/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/16/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/02/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/02/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/07/2006