Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/20/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/20/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/20/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/20/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/20/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/20/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/20/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/20/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/20/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/20/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/20/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/20/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/20/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/20/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/20/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/20/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/20/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/20/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/20/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/20/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/29/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/25/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/25/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/25/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/25/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/25/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/25/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/25/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/25/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/06/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/06/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/06/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/14/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/14/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/16/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/05/2006