There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Reporters' Shield bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Free Flow of Information Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To maintain the free flow of information to the public by providing conditions for the federally compelled disclosure of information by certain persons connected with the news media.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/18/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/14/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H877-878)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2005Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2005Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5969)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/18/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/25/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/25/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/25/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/25/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/26/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/26/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/26/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/26/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/26/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/26/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/26/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/26/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/26/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/26/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/26/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/26/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/26/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/07/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/07/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/15/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/26/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/26/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/26/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 10/06/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 12/14/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/04/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/19/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/27/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/18/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3323. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/18/2005)

Free Flow of Information Act of 2005 - Prohibits a federal entity from compelling a "covered person" (i.e., a newspaper, television broadcast station, wire service, or other media outlet, and specified employees and contractors) to testify or produce any document unless a court determines that: (1) the party seeking to compel has unsuccessfully attempted to obtain such testimony or document from all other non-covered persons; (2) in a criminal matter, there are reasonable grounds to believe a crime has occurred and the testimony or document sought is essential to the investigation, prosecution, or defense of the crime; (3) in a non-criminal matter, the testimony or document is essential to a dispositive issue of substantial importance; and (4) in any matter in which testimony or a document could reveal the source's identity, disclosure is necessary to prevent imminent and actual harm to national security and such harm outweighs the public interest in protecting the free flow of information.

Requires the content of compelled testimony or documents to be limited and narrowly tailored. Exempts certain commercial or financial information.

Makes this Act applicable to testimony or documents that a third party or federal entity seeks from a communications service provider relating to business transactions with a covered person. Sets forth notice requirements. Permits a court to delay notice to a covered person upon determining that such notice would pose a substantial threat to the integrity of a criminal investigation.