Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/18/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/25/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/25/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/25/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/25/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/25/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/25/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/26/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/26/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/26/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/26/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/26/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/26/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/26/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/26/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/26/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/26/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/26/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/26/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/26/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/07/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/07/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/15/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/26/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/26/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/26/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 10/06/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 12/14/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/04/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/19/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/27/2006