Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/01/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/01/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/01/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/01/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/01/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/01/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/08/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/15/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/15/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/01/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/08/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/08/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/16/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/16/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/12/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/19/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/26/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/19/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/19/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/07/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/29/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/17/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/22/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/25/2006