Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/28/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/28/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/28/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/06/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/06/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/06/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/06/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/06/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/06/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/06/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/06/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/06/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/08/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/08/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/08/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/13/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/13/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/15/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/15/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/15/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/15/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/15/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/15/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/15/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/15/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/26/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/26/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/26/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/26/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/26/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/26/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/26/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/26/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/26/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/26/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/26/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/26/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/26/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/26/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/26/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/26/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/26/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/26/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/27/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/27/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/27/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/29/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/29/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/29/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/29/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/29/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/07/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/07/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/07/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/18/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/18/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/20/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/20/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/26/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/26/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/02/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/02/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/09/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/09/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/09/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/15/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/06/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/06/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/06/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 12/08/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/08/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/16/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/14/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/15/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/16/2006