Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/26/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/26/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/26/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/27/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/27/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/27/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/27/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/27/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/27/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/27/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/27/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/27/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/27/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/27/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/27/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/27/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/27/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/27/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/28/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/28/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/28/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/29/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/29/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/06/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/06/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/06/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/14/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/17/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/14/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/15/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/16/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/16/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/16/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/16/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/16/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/16/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/01/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/01/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/07/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/14/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/14/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/14/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/14/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/16/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/29/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/29/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/05/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/26/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/03/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/03/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/03/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/03/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/03/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/08/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/18/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/02/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/21/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/09/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 11/15/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/05/2006