Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 07/20/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/27/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/27/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/27/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/27/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/08/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/18/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/01/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/01/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/08/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/08/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/08/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/28/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/18/2006