Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/20/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/20/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/22/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/25/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/25/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/26/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/28/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/06/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/06/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/06/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/06/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/06/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/13/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/13/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/13/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/13/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/13/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/15/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/20/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/21/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/28/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/06/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/17/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/17/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/19/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/25/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/01/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/01/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/02/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/07/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/07/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/15/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/15/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/15/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/16/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/17/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/06/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/06/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 12/06/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/06/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/13/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/01/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/07/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/07/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/14/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/16/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/29/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/04/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 04/04/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/06/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/25/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/09/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/12/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/24/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/25/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/28/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/06/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/07/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/25/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 09/29/2006