Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/21/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/21/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 07/21/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/22/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/28/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/29/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/07/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/08/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/08/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/08/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/08/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/13/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/13/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 09/13/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/20/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/20/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/20/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/20/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/20/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/20/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/22/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 09/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/29/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/29/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/29/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/29/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/29/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/06/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/06/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/17/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 10/17/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/17/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/20/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/20/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/20/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/28/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/28/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/28/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/01/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/01/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/04/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/04/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 11/10/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/10/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/10/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/18/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/08/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/08/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 12/08/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/16/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/18/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/08/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/05/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/18/2006