Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 07/21/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/21/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/27/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/29/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/29/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/29/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/06/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/15/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/28/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/06/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/18/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 11/01/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/03/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 11/17/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/17/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/17/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/16/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/16/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/16/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/04/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/27/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/02/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/09/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/10/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/18/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/25/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/27/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew