Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/27/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/29/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/06/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/18/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/17/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/02/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/09/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/25/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew