Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/15/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/16/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/16/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/27/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/27/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew