Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/27/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/06/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/06/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/01/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/17/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/04/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/02/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/25/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew